I Am Bored

Loads of viral videos, games, memes, lists and social networking for when you're bored. Updated every day, so visit often.
LatestPopularMost BookmarkedMost EmailedTop RatedMy FavoritesRandomChat
AllGamesFunnyEntertainmentQuizzesWeirdTechLifestyle, Arts & Lit.News & PoliticsScienceSportsMisc
Submit Content  





rss

friendsmore friends | add your site
Asylum

Holy Taco

Funny Videos

BuzzFeed

NothingToxic

Oddee

Mousebreaker

Online Games

Eat Liver

Online Games

Gorilla Mask

Full Downloads

Norway Games

Damn Cool Pics

Kontraband

Extreme Humor

X Hollywood

I Dont Like You

123 Games

Hollywoodtuna

Funny Games

Cool Stuff

Viva La Games

X - Vids

Smit Happens

Funny Videos

Funny Stuff

ebaumsworld



Back to Listing

How Japanese Children Learn To Multiply [Pic]

Hits: 11209 | Rating: (3.0) | Category: Misc. | Added by: ElectricEye
Page: 1 2 Next >   Jump to: Bottom    Last Post
TJEx
Male, 30-39, Canada
 50 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 10:52:55 PM
Common Core will just say that if you confuse the teacher enough and BS enough you can get 2+2=5 marked correct.

Gerry1of1
Male, 50-59, Western US
 33910 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 5:34:45 PM

I got stuck at '5'

MikeyNiv
Male, 18-29, Europe
 701 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 1:45:19 PM
This is really old and not even that effective, simple long multiplication is easier

YugureKage
Female, 18-29, Midwest US
 1211 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 9:39:51 AM
the new way kids here are being taught to multiply is just freaking strange

Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 9:26:46 AM
@Mikeoxdbiggg
Imagine quantum physics or simple integral methods.
I doubt I would come up with this by my self, but this appears quite "simple".

drawman61
Male, 50-59, Europe
 6099 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 8:37:54 AM
@essersmith- Ah, I see it now, thanks.

Mikeoxsbiggg
Male, 30-39, Canada
 1232 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 7:59:45 AM
My question is how does someone sit down and hammer this method out? Imagine the trial and error beforehand.

Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 7:54:24 AM
@Deyv well put.

deyv87
Male, 18-29, Midwest US
 301 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 7:16:44 AM
To be honest, this is good for teaching the concepts behind multiplication of multi-digit numbers in a way that naturally leads to polynomial multiplication. It's just pointing out that the first one, 13*12, is equivalent to (10+3)*(10+2), then you distribute it to 10*10+10*3+10*2+3*2 which equals 156. Same for anything larger. 123*456 = (100+20+3)*(400*50*6)=(100*400 + 100*50 + 100*6 + 20*400 + 20*50 + 20*6 + 3*400 + 3*50 + 3*6)= 40000 + 5000 + 600 + 8000 + 1000 + 120 + 1200 + 150 + 18 = 56088. The concept expands to polynomial multiplication since everything so far has just been polynomial multiplication with single digit coefficients and with x=10. So if x=10, then (327*151) = (3x^2+2x+7)*(x^2+5x+1)= (3x^4 + 15x^3 + 3x^2 + 2x^3 + 10x^2 + 2x + 7x^2 + 35x + 7) = 3x^4+17x^3+20x^2+37x+7. Plugging 10 back in for x, 30000+17000+2000+370+7 = 49377.

patchouly
Male, 40-49, Canada
 4606 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 5:57:21 AM
Slow and crude. I think the way we do it is much more efficient.

Laran
Male, 30-39, Australia
 261 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 5:34:22 AM
This is called Vedic maths.
Its actually from India.as a kid I could use this method before I learned the western method.
My teachers actually graded my work as an F once because even though my answers were correct, I could not show them my working out.

Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 3:20:04 AM
@drawman

They count the number of times lines cross eachother. They go left to right, counting diagonally. So 1, 5, 6. Means that top left the lines cross 1 time. middle diagonal they cross a total of 5 times and bottom right cross 6 times.

The numbers represent digits and 1's, 10's, 100's and so on. going from high to low. The 1 represent 100, 5 represent 50 and the 6 representy 6.

If the lines add up to say 12. Then, given the lines location, it represents 12, 120, 1200 and/or so on.
Try to apply it to the slightly larger calculation. It makes sense, in a japanese kind of way.

drawman61
Male, 50-59, Europe
 6099 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 2:30:17 AM
So is someone going to explain?
No one I always hated mathS.

Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 1:12:18 AM
Lets try again:

996 * 693 = 690228
Less than a minute to do by "old fashion" hand calculation. This is slow aswell I suppose.

About 2 minutes with the japanese system.
Id love to see a japanese person do this, I presume the drawing of the system becomes less needed once you get used to it.


Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 12:54:37 AM
Crud, I miscalculated, I didnt count the blue lines!

Essersmith
Male, 18-29, Europe
 273 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 12:51:54 AM
@Nickel2

553 * 352 = 194656

I tried it the japanese way. Perhaps once you are very familiar with the system its fast. But it took me longer to sit and count and add than it took the way I was taught.

Nickel2
Male, 50-59, Europe
 4643 Posts
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 12:27:52 AM
The Scots are well known for being calculating...



wolfguy423
Male, 18-29, Western US
 169 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 11:42:35 PM
this is extremely cool and easy! Ive learned this before in school.

whirlygirl
Female, 30-39, Canada
 227 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 10:42:10 PM
I want to learn how to do this! Just... because.

jinxiejae
Female, 30-39, Western US
 2760 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 10:22:24 PM
wait...what? what the hell are the blobs even for?
I cant...I dont even...what?

incubus_inc
Male, 18-29, Eastern US
 962 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 9:08:46 PM
geomegebra. i love it.

Runemang
Male, 30-39, Midwest US
 2657 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 8:46:20 PM
whoa.

Draculya
Male, 40-49, Asia
 12401 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 8:41:12 PM
We've covered this method here before

Magentab0b
Female, 30-39, Western US
 1462 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 8:40:50 PM
I prefer long division and long multiplication when doing things by hand it's easier/quicker for me to double check.
In my head I prefer weird approximations or dealing with fractions.

drworm2002
Male, 30-39, Western US
 578 Posts
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 7:24:43 PM
The calculator is Korean not Japanese.

Page: 1 2 Next > 

You Must be Signed in to Add a Comment

If you've already got an I-Am-Bored.com account,
click here to sign in.

If you don't have an account yet,
Click Here to Create a Free Account
 

Back to Listing ^top


Bored | Suggest a Link | Advertise | Contact I Am Bored | About I Am Bored | Link to I Am Bored | Live Submission | Privacy | TOS | Ad Choices | Copyright Policy |
© 2014 Demand Media, Inc. All rights reserved.